Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Pieramico

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1799BornSant’Angelo
21 Sep 182223.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 183738.6SelectedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
12 Feb 183838.7ConfirmedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
18 Feb 183838.7Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
Sep 1862³63.3DiedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Pieramico (VIAF: 89323914)
Bishop Michelangelo Pieramico (born , died Sep 1862) Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016