Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Mazzetti, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1778BornChieti
27 Apr 183657.4SelectedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
11 Jul 183657.6ConfirmedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
16 Jul 183657.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
5 Feb 183859.2ResignedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
15 Feb 183859.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
14 Jul 185071.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Mazzetti:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Mazzetti O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 84, and Page 341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013