Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Antonio Scotti

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1786BornProcida
18 Feb 180923.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 184458.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
11 Feb 184458.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
6 May 184559.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica

MicroData Summary for Angelo Antonio Scotti:
Archbishop Angelo Antonio Scotti (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013