Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Silvestri

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1785Born
25 Feb 180924.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 184459.3SelectedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
17 Jun 184459.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
24 Jun 184459.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
15 Sep 184863.6DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Silvestri
Archbishop Domenico Silvestri (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria Capua Vetere
Ordained BishopS. Maria de la Scala, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,844, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast