Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico-Maria-Giuseppe Lo Jacono, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1786BornSiculiana
30 Nov 180822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
22 Jul 181024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 May 184458.1SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
17 Jun 184458.2ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
30 Jun 184458.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
24 Mar 186074.0DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico-Maria-Giuseppe Lo Jacono (VIAF: 89171374)
Bishop Domenico-Maria-Giuseppe Lo Jacono C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 63
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1844, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016