Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Alfonso (Lorenzo) Serafini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1773BornCamerata Nuovo, Italy
12 Mar 179622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Apr 184066.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
31 May 184067.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
3 Jan 184672.6DiedTitular Bishop of Corycus

MicroData Summary for Domenico Alfonso (Lorenzo) Serafini
Bishop Domenico Alfonso (Lorenzo) Serafini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Corycus

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016