Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Fanelli

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1806Born
19 May 185447.7SelectedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
23 Jun 185447.8ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
9 Jul 185447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
8 Jun 189184.8DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Fanelli (VIAF: 90350058)
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Fanelli (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiccia di Molise, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSs. Jean et Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017