Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Mesmer

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1818Born
26 Mar 184223.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 188364.6AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
19 Aug 188364.6Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
12 Dec 189273.9DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Mesmer (VIAF: 89253424)
Bishop Tommaso Mesmer (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnagni, Diocese of Anagni
Ordained BishopSt Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 542
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017