Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tullio Sericci

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1829Born
18 Dec 185223.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 188354.3AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
19 Aug 188354.3Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
5 Jul 190273.2DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tullio Sericci (VIAF: 89131320)
Bishop Tullio Sericci (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana
Ordained BishopSt Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017