Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Caldajoli

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1847Born
11 Jun 187023.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 188336.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grosseto, Italy
9 Aug 188336.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
19 Aug 188336.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
1 Mar 188436.9SucceededBishop of Grosseto, Italy
27 Feb 190759.8DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Caldajoli (VIAF: 304916358)
Bishop Bernardino Caldajoli (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel del Piano
Ordained BishopSt Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 292, and Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017