Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Mezzetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Livorno, Italy

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1825Born
17 Jun 184822.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187449.2AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
3 Jan 187549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
13 Aug 1880³54.8ResignedBishop of Livorno, Italy
20 Aug 188054.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
1881¹55.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Livorno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Mezzetti (VIAF: 89241317)
Bishop Raffaele Mezzetti (born , died 1881) Bishop Emeritus of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca, Archdiocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 266, and Page 341
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Sep 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Mar 2017