Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio (Blasius) Sibilia

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1822Born
21 Dec 184422.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 188361.5AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
19 Aug 188361.5Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
7 Apr 189371.1DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio (Blasius) Sibilia
Bishop Biagio (Blasius) Sibilia (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnagni, Diocese of Anagni
Ordained BishopSt Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017