Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Federici

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1844Born
19 Dec 186823.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188843.4AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
10 Jun 188843.4Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
6 Aug 189247.6DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Federici
Bishop Federico Federici (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel d'Emilio
Ordained BishopCapranica College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1888, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017