Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Latoni

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1821³Born
6 Apr 184422.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 187958.0AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
1 Jun 187958.0Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
7 Jul 188059.1DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Latoni (VIAF: 89185710)
Bishop Francesco Latoni (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePergola
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 513
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017