Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopoldo Ruggiero

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1821Born
8 Mar 184524.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 187756.0AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
18 Mar 187756.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
11 Mar 188665.0DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Ruggiero (VIAF: 254412546)
Archbishop Leopoldo Ruggiero (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Charles ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 530
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017