Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Macario Sorini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1834BornRecanati
20 Dec 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188348.9AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
1 Apr 188349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
12 Jun 189359.2ResignedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
12 Jun 189359.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
18 Mar 189560.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Gubbio, Italy
19 Apr 190066.0ResignedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
19 Apr 190066.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
31 Dec 190066.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Macario Sorini:
Archbishop Macario Sorini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gubbio

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 264, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 366, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013