Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1820Born
1846¹25.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
21 Jun 187857.5AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
25 Aug 187857.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
23 Jul 188160.6DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel McCarthy (VIAF: 48795744)
Bishop Daniel McCarthy (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKenmare, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe
Ordained BishopCathedral, Killarney

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017