Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Flannery

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1818Born
5 Jan 184324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
6 Jul 185840.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
6 Jul 185840.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
5 Sep 185840.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
29 Jul 185941.1SucceededBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
19 Jun 189173.0DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Flannery
Bishop Michael Flannery (born , died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScariff

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 332, and Page 553
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017