Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Keane

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1805Born
2 Jul 182823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
20 Dec 185045.7AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
2 Feb 185145.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
15 May 185752.1AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
15 Jan 187468.7DiedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Keane (VIAF: 315629373)
Bishop William Keane (born , died ) Bishop of Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlemartyr, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212, and Page 486
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Jan 2017