Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Ryan

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1806²Born
1830²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Killaloe, Ireland
21 Nov 187165.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
21 Nov 187165.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
4 Feb 187266.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Echinus
20 Jul 188983.5DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Ryan
Bishop James Ryan (born 1806, died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlen, Diocese of Killaloe
Ordained BishopNenagh

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256, and Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017