Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Leahy

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1806Born
18 Jun 183327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
15 May 185750.9AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
29 Jun 185751.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
26 Jan 187568.6DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Leahy (VIAF: 315625219)
Archbishop Patrick Leahy (born , died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGortnahoe, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly)
Ordained BishopThurles, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly)

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017