Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Higgins

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1826Born
20 Sep 185125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
23 Dec 188155.7AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
5 Feb 188255.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
1 May 188963.1DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Andrew Higgins
Bishop Andrew Higgins (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillarney, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe
Ordained BishopSte. Marie, Cathedral, Killarney, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017