Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Timothy O’Mahony

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario

Titular Bishop of Eudocias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1825BornAberle, Ireland
25 Mar 184923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
1 Oct 186943.8AppointedBishop of Armidale, Australia
30 Nov 186944.0Ordained BishopBishop of Armidale, Australia
2 Aug 187751.7ResignedBishop of Armidale, Australia
14 Nov 187954.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eudocias
14 Nov 187954.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
8 Sep 189266.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Armidale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Thomas Timothy O’Mahony:
Bishop Thomas Timothy O’Mahony (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 123, and Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013