Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Kinsella

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1796Born
15 May 181822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Dec 181923.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 182933.2AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
26 Jul 182933.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
12 Dec 184549.8DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Kinsella
Bishop William Kinsella (born , died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallynunnery, Co. Carlow
Ordained BishopKilkenny
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Cathedral

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 26
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,321
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 57, and Page 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast