Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Doyle, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1785Born
1805²19.2EnteredMember of Order of St. Augustine
1809²23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
27 Aug 181933.9AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
14 Nov 181934.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
15 Jun 183448.7DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Doyle
Bishop James Doyle O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Ross, Co. Wexford
Ordained PriestEnniscorthy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Carlow

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 228
  • bp/ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 67
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast