Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Nolan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1794¹Born
8 Aug 183440.6AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
28 Oct 183440.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
14 Oct 183743.8DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Nolan:
Bishop Edward Nolan (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013