Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Scallan, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Newfoundland

Titular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1765²BornWexford, Ireland
1791²26.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Mar 181550.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
20 Mar 181550.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
1 May 181651.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
23 Sep 181651.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
7 Jun 183065.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Scallan:
Bishop Thomas Scallan O.F.M. (born 1765, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Newfoundland

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015