Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Ryan

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1768²Born
18 Dec 179022.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Mar 179123.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 180436.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ferns, Ireland
2 Oct 180436.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
2 Feb 180537.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
14 Jan 181446.0SucceededBishop of Ferns, Ireland
9 Mar 181951.1DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Ryan
Bishop Patrick Ryan (born 1768, died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallinakill, near Kilcock, Co. Kildare
Buried Place (Original)Church, Enniscorthy

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 193, and Page 203
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 117, and Page 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Aug 2020

Quantcast