Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Thomas Plunkett

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1765²Born
8 Mar 178823.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
17 May 178823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1792²27.0IncardinatedPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
4 Oct 181449.7AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
24 Feb 181550.1Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
27 Apr 182762.3DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Thomas Plunkett
Bishop George Thomas Plunkett (born 1765, died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBothar, Drumlion
Ordained PriestMalines
Ordained BishopS. Andrew, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceVersailles, France
Buried Place (Original)St. Symphorien, Cemetery

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 185
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 110
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,661
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,515
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast