Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Delany

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1747²Born
1770²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
13 May 178336.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
13 May 178336.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dausara
31 Aug 178336.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dausara
18 Sep 178740.7SucceededBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
9 Jul 181467.5DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Delany
Bishop Daniel Delany (born 1747, died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaddock, Co. Laois, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin
Ordained BishopTullow
Buried Place (Original)Church, Tullow

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 192, and Page 248
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 227
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 32
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: CB, 10 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,082
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast