Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Lambert, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Newfoundland

Titular Bishop of Chytri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1754²BornGurtinminogue, Ireland
1779¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Jul 180551.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
30 Jul 180551.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chytri
4 May 180652.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chytri
11 Apr 180753.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
23 Sep 181662.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
1817²63.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Newfoundland, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Lambert:
Bishop Patrick Lambert O.F.M. , Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Newfoundland

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015