Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Anthony Fleming, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1792²Born
Sep 1814³22.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
15 Oct 181523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
10 Jul 182937.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
10 Jul 182937.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
28 Oct 182937.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
7 Jun 183038.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
4 Jun 184755.4AppointedBishop of Newfoundland, Canada
14 Jul 185058.5DiedBishop of Newfoundland, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Anthony Fleming (VIAF: 104521570)
Bishop Michael Anthony Fleming O.F.M. Ref. (born 1792, died ) Bishop of Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrick-on-Suir, Ireland
Ordained BishopOld, Chapel, Saint John’s, Diocese of Newfoundland

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 322
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017