Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edward Cardinal MacCabe

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1816Born
24 Jun 183923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
30 Jan 185538.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
30 Jan 185538.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
26 Jun 187761.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
26 Jun 187761.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
25 Jul 187761.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
4 Apr 187963.1AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
27 Mar 188266.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 188266.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
11 Feb 188568.9DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Edward MacCabe (VIAF: 315944980)
Edward Cardinal MacCabe (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 252, and Page 279
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Mar 1882
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016