Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sofronio Hacbang y Gaborni

Deceased

Bishop of Calbayog


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1887BornCalbiga
22 Jan 191123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Calbayog, Philippines
8 Nov 191830.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calbayog, Philippines
8 Nov 191830.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
8 Jun 191931.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
22 Feb 192335.2AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
3 Apr 193749.3DiedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Sofronio Hacbang y Gaborni:
Bishop Sofronio Hacbang y Gaborni (born , died ) Bishop of Calbayog

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 55
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1919, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013