Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Finnemann, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect of Mindoro

Titular Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1882BornBŁninghausen, Germany
29 Jun 191128.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Feb 192946.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
8 Feb 192946.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sora
21 May 192946.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sora
4 Dec 193654.0AppointedPrefect of Mindoro, Philippines
26 Oct 194259.9DiedPrefect of Mindoro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Finnemann:
Bishop Wilhelm Finnemann S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect of Mindoro

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1929, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013