Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Fontevecchia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1886BornFermo
25 Jul 190923.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 193650.1AppointedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
15 Aug 193650.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
19 Apr 195265.9ResignedBishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
19 Apr 195265.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
16 Jan 195972.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Fontevecchia:
Bishop Michele Fontevecchia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1936, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013