Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Bandini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sarsina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1894BornFaenza
18 Dec 192026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
17 Oct 195358.9AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
20 Dec 195359.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
1 May 197681.4RetiredBishop of Sarsina, Italy
13 Apr 198994.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bandini:
Bishop Carlo Bandini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sarsina

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013