Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amedeo Polidori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fossombrone

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1883BornMaenza
31 Jul 191026.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 193148.0AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
15 Nov 193148.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
10 Jan 193248.3InstalledBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
2 Feb 196177.3RetiredBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
2 Feb 196177.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
11 Aug 197187.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Amedeo Polidori:
Bishop Amedeo Polidori (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013