Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flaviano Simoneschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1826BornPriverno
30 Mar 185024.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188054.1AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
25 Apr 188054.2Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
2 Jul 1883³57.4ResignedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
9 Aug 188357.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
13 Jan 188963.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Flaviano Simoneschi:
Bishop Flaviano Simoneschi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 301, and Page 542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013