Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Giuseppe Palma, C.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1830Born
19 May 188554.8AppointedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
24 May 188554.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
2 Feb 189261.5DiedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giuseppe Palma (VIAF: 89311838)
Archbishop Paolo Giuseppe Palma C.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017