Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anacleto Chicaro, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto, Egypt

Titular Archbishop of Hemesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1816Born
12 May 188164.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
12 May 188164.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
17 May 188164.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
22 May 188164.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
5 Oct 188872.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
5 Oct 188872.1ResignedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
16 Apr 189376.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto, Egypt

MicroData Summary for Anacleto Chicaro
Archbishop Anacleto Chicaro O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Felice, Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Barthelemy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017