Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vincenzo Testa, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1820Born
1 Dec 183616.4ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
10 Jun 184322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
21 Dec 187454.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Segni, Italy
21 Dec 187454.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
10 Jan 187554.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
26 May 187756.8SucceededBishop of Segni, Italy
22 Apr 188362.7DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vincenzo Testa
Bishop Antonio Vincenzo Testa O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel Madama, Diocese of Tivoli
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 154, and Page 518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017