Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopoldo Angelo Santanchè, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1818Born
2 Mar 184425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
3 Mar 187152.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
3 Mar 187152.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
24 Aug 187152.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
13 Nov 187456.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
3 Apr 187657.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
10 Feb 188364.3DiedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Angelo Santanchè (VIAF: 106896480)
Archbishop Leopoldo Angelo Santanchè O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcquasanta, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained BishopSte Anne, Curacao

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 267
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Mar 2017