Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Marangoni, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1820Born
184322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1864²43.4AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1872²51.4ResignedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
22 Dec 187454.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gortyna
10 Jan 187554.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gortyna
21 Sep 187757.1AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
21 Nov 190888.3DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Marangoni
Bishop Ludovico Marangoni O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 211, and Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Mar 2017