Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Šimun Milinović, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1835Born
8 Oct 188651.6AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
7 Nov 188651.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
24 Mar 191075.0DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Šimun Milinović (VIAF: 56083655)
Archbishop Šimun Milinović O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLovreć
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 57
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017