Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Cavalieri Manassi

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1770BornComacchio
25 May 179323.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 182050.0AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
27 Feb 182050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
19 Aug 182656.5DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cavalieri Manassi
Bishop Carlo Cavalieri Manassi (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1820, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016