Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottaviano della Raverta (Rovere)

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1516¹Born
27 Nov 154529.9AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
1553²37.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
1560²44.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
10 Mar 156044.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
28 Nov 156044.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Jun 1561³45.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Oct 1561³45.7DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano della Raverta (Rovere) (VIAF: 289047232)
Bishop Ottaviano della Raverta (Rovere) (born 1516, died Oct 1561) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 310
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018