Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Muzio Gaeta (Jr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1686BornNapoli
30 May 171124.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172336.2AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
24 Feb 172336.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
19 Dec 173549.1AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
16 Sep 175467.8AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
19 Mar 176477.4DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Muzio Gaeta (Jr.):
Archbishop Muzio Gaeta (Jr.) (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116, and Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015