Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria de Dura, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1674³Born
25 Jun 169218.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Jul 169824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Mar 172348.7AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
29 Mar 172348.7Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
Feb 1724²49.6DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria de Dura
Bishop Luigi Maria de Dura O.P. (born , died Feb 1724) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018