Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Forni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1666BornModena
6 Mar 169427.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 172356.9AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
23 May 172357.0Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
21 Nov 175084.5ResignedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
1755¹88.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Forni:
Bishop Luigi Forni (born , died 1755) Bishop Emeritus of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 331
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015